Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Charles (Paul) Cardinal Philippe, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

Cardinal-Priest of San Pio V a Villa Carpegna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1905Born
4 Apr 193125.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Jul 193227.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Dec 195954.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
28 Aug 196257.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heracleopolis Magna
21 Sep 196257.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heracleopolis Magna
29 Jun 196762.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
5 Mar 197367.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Pio V a Villa Carpegna
5 Mar 197367.8Elevated to Cardinal
6 Mar 197367.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
27 Jun 198075.1RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches
2 Feb 198377.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pio V a Villa Carpegna
9 Apr 198478.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Oriental Churches

MicroData Summary for Pierre Charles (Paul) Philippe (VIAF: 71459559)
Pierre Charles (Paul) Cardinal Philippe O.P. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Oriental Churches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSte Trinité of "Le Saulchoir", Convent, Kain-la-Tombe, Diocese of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
Ordained BishopSt. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
  • a cardinal for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 153
  • sole/c1/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 20 Jul 2018

Quantcast