Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Caloyera, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1915Born
16 Jul 193924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 May 195539.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey
197660.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Istanbul (Constantinople) (Greek), Turkey
7 Dec 197863.3AppointedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
10 Feb 197963.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
22 Jan 198367.5ResignedArchbishop of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey
7 Aug 200792.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne), Turkey

MicroData Summary for Domenico Caloyera
Archbishop Domenico Caloyera O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Izmir (Smirne)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIstanbul

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast