Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ferdinando Giuseppe Cardinal Antonelli, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

Cardinal-Priest of San Sebastiano al Palatino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1896BornSubbiano, Italy
7 Apr 191417.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 Jul 192226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Jan 196568.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Rites
19 Feb 196669.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Idicra
19 Mar 196669.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Idicra
7 May 196972.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
2 Feb 197376.5ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints
5 Mar 197376.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino
5 Mar 197376.6Elevated to Cardinal
2 Feb 198386.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sebastiano al Palatino
12 Jul 199396.9DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for the Causes of Saints

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Giuseppe Antonelli:
Ferdinando Giuseppe Cardinal Antonelli O.F.M. (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Causes of Saints

  • a priest for 70.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
  • a cardinal for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ab/sect/xdws: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 57, Page 268
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015