Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dino Trabalzini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza-Bisignano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1923Born
5 Apr 194723.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 196642.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
11 Feb 196642.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
19 Mar 196642.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Munatiana
28 Jun 197148.1AppointedBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
18 Mar 198056.8AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza e Bisignano, Italy
6 Jun 199875.1RetiredArchbishop of Cosenza-Bisignano, Italy
14 Jul 200380.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cosenza-Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Dino Trabalzini
Archbishop Dino Trabalzini (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza-Bisignano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontepulciano

  • a priest for 56.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018