Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Federici

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli-Frosinone

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1911BornCastelgrande
26 Jul 193625.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 196251.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
22 Sep 196251.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidyma
28 Oct 196251.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidyma
27 Oct 196352.4AppointedArchbishop of Santa Severina, Italy
21 Dec 197362.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy
21 Dec 197362.5AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
23 Nov 198069.4DiedBishop of Veroli-Frosinone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Federici:
Archbishop Michele Federici (born , died ) Bishop of Veroli-Frosinone

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 174

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013