Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Graziani

Archbishop of Crotone-Santa Severina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1944 BornCalopezzati
5 Jan 196823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
30 Sep 198642.4IncardinatedPriest of Crotone-Santa Severina, Italy
21 Aug 199955.2AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
10 Oct 199955.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
21 Nov 200662.5AppointedArchbishop of Crotone-Santa Severina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Graziani:
Archbishop Domenico Graziani (born ) Archbishop of Crotone-Santa Severina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Crotone-Santa Severina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,637
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013