Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrea Mugione

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1940Born
28 Jun 196423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Aversa, Italy
17 Mar 198847.3AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
28 Apr 198847.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
21 Nov 199858.0AppointedArchbishop of Crotone-Santa Severina, Italy
3 May 200665.4AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
18 Feb 201675.2RetiredArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
26 Feb 202079.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Mugione (VIAF: 256099006)
Archbishop Andrea Mugione (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaivano, Diocese of Aversa
Ordained PriestSan Paolo, Cathedral, Aversa, Diocese of Aversa
Ordained BishopSan Paolo, Cathedral, Aversa, Diocese of Aversa
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,555
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2016
  • d: CB, 26 Feb 2020
  • c1/loc: AM, 4 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 25 May 2020

Quantcast