Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Angelo Raffaele Panzetta

Archbishop-Elect of Crotone-Santa Severina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1966 Born
14 Apr 199326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Taranto, Italy
7 Nov 201953.1AppointedArchbishop of Crotone-Santa Severina, Italy
27 Dec 201953.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Crotone-Santa Severina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Raffaele Panzetta
Father Angelo Raffaele Panzetta (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Crotone-Santa Severina

EventPlace
Birth PlacePulsano, Archdiocese of Taranto
Ordained BishopGran Madre di Dio, Co-Cathedral, Taranto, Archdiocese of Taranto

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Crotone-Santa Severina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2019
  • ob/c1: CB, 7 Nov 2019
  • c2: CB, 17 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 18 Nov 2019

Quantcast