Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Staglian˛

Bishop of Noto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1959 BornIsola Capo Rizzuto
20 Oct 198425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
22 Jan 200949.6AppointedBishop of Noto, Italy
19 Mar 200949.7Ordained BishopBishop of Noto, Italy
31 Mar 200949.7InstalledBishop of Noto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Staglian˛
Bishop Antonio Staglian˛ (born ) Bishop of Noto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Noto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2009
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,069

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 May 2016