Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Corrado Lorefice

Archbishop of Palermo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1962 Born
26 Sep 198623.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Noto, Italy
30 Dec 198725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Noto, Italy
27 Oct 201553.0AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
5 Dec 201553.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Corrado Lorefice (VIAF: 186237647)
Archbishop Corrado Lorefice (born ) Archbishop of Palermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIspica

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Palermo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 30 Oct 2015
  • c2: CB, 1 Nov 2015
  • c34: CB, 24 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,682

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Apr 2017