Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Accolla

Archbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1951 Born
16 Apr 197725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Siracusa, Italy
20 Oct 201665.1AppointedArchbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
7 Dec 201665.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
7 Jan 201765.3InstalledArchbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Accolla
Archbishop Giovanni Accolla (born ) Archbishop of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiracusa, Archdiocese of Siracusa
Ordained BishopSantuario Madonna delle Lacrime, Basilica, Siracusa, Archdiocese of Siracusa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Messina-Lipari-Santa Lucia del Mela.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2016
  • ob: CB, 24 Oct 2016
  • i/c2: CB, 27 Oct 2016
  • c3+: CB, 7 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017