Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Crociata

Bishop of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1953 BornCastelvetrano
29 Jun 197926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
16 Jul 200754.3AppointedBishop of Noto, Italy
6 Oct 200754.6Ordained BishopBishop of Noto, Italy
25 Sep 200855.5ResignedBishop of Noto, Italy
19 Nov 201360.7AppointedBishop of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno, Italy
15 Dec 201360.7InstalledBishop of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mariano Crociata:
Bishop Mariano Crociata (born ) Bishop of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,549
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2013
  • i: CB, 29 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 30 Nov 2013