Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Calogero Peri, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Caltagirone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1953 Born
7 Oct 197017.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Oct 197623.3Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Dec 197825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
30 Jan 201056.6AppointedBishop of Caltagirone, Italy
20 Mar 201056.7Ordained BishopBishop of Caltagirone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Calogero Peri
Bishop Calogero Peri O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Caltagirone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalemi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caltagirone.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,595

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018