Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Russotto

Bishop of Caltanissetta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1957 Born
29 Jun 198123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ragusa, Italy
2 Aug 200346.0AppointedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
27 Sep 200346.1Ordained BishopBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Russotto
Bishop Mario Russotto (born ) Bishop of Caltanissetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVittoria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caltanissetta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,467

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018