Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Rizzo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ragusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1926Born
31 Oct 194822.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 197447.8AppointedBishop of Ragusa, Italy
18 Mar 197447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ragusa, Italy
16 Feb 200275.8RetiredBishop of Ragusa, Italy
16 Jul 200983.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Ragusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Rizzo
Bishop Angelo Rizzo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ragusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontedoro

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017