Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Monaco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1898BornAgira
15 Feb 192526.5Ordained PriestPriest of Nicosia, Italy
12 Dec 195355.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
12 Dec 195355.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
24 Feb 195455.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germa in Galatia
2 Oct 195658.1SucceededBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
21 Dec 197375.3RetiredBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
9 Feb 198687.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Monaco:
Bishop Francesco Monaco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015