Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Paruzzo

Bishop Emeritus of Ourinhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1945 Born
29 Jun 196923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Caltanissetta, Italy
30 Dec 199853.2AppointedBishop of Ourinhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Mar 199953.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ourinhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 May 202175.5RetiredBishop of Ourinhos, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Paruzzo
Bishop Salvatore Paruzzo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ourinhos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontedoro, Italy
Ordained BishopVargem Grande Paulista, Jesus Eucaristia, Church, Mariápolis Araceli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ourinhos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,487
  • r: Bollettino, 19 May 2021
  • opd/c1: CB, 19 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 May 2021

Quantcast