Bishop(s)
Suffragan Dioceses
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Botucatu | |||
7 June 1908 | Erected | Diocese of São Paulo | Diocese of Botucatu (erected) |
4 July 1924 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Botucatu
Archdiocese of São Paulo Diocese of Taubaté | Diocese of Sorocaba (erected) |
21 June 1926 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Botucatu (Noroeste and Alta Paulista) | Diocese of Cafelândia (erected) |
30 November 1928 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Botucatu (Assisi, Campos Novos, Candido Motta, Conçeieao de Monte Alegre, Maraeahy, Palmital, Paraguassù, Platina, Presidente Prudente, Quota, Salto Grande, Santo Anastasio, and San Pedro do Turvo) | Diocese of Assis (erected) |
5 February 1932 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Botucatu (Parish of Itahy) | Diocese of Sorocaba |
5 February 1932 | Territory Added | Diocese of Sorocaba (Parish of Bofate) | Diocese of Botucatu |
Archdiocese of Botucatu | |||
19 April 1958 | Elevated | Diocese of Botucatu | Archdiocese of Botucatu |
15 February 1964 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Botucatu (Agudos, Boracela, Cabrália Paulista, Duartina, Gália, Lucianópolis, Pederneiras, Piratininga, and part of Bauru)
Diocese of Lins (Arealva, Avai, Iacanga, and parts of Bauru) | Diocese of Bauru (erected) |
2 March 1968 | Territory Lost | Archdiocese of Botucatu (Factura, Itaí, Paranapanema, and Taguaí)
Diocese of Sorocaba (Barao de Antonina, Buri, Capao Bonito, Coronel Macedo, Guapiara, Itaberá, Itapeva, Itaporanga, Itararé, Ribeirão Branco, Ribeirão Vermelho do Sul, and Taquarituba) Diocese of Santos (Apiai, Barra do Turvo, Iporanga, and Ribeira) | Diocese of Itapeva (erected) |
27 April 1990 | Territory Added | Diocese of Piracicaba (Rest of Anhembi) | Archdiocese of Botucatu |
30 December 1998 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Assis
Archdiocese of Botucatu Diocese of Itapeva (Fartura and Taguaí) | Diocese of Ourinhos (erected) (Ourinhos, Santa Cruz do Rio Pardo, Espirito Santo do Turvo, Camitar, Chavantes, Ipaussu, Timburi, Sarutaiá, Tejupá, Piraju, Bernardino do Campo, Manduri, Oleo, Ibirarema, Salto Grande, Ribeirao do Sul, São Pedro do Turvo, Ocauçu, Lupércio, Alvinlândia,...) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diocese of Botucatu | ||||||||||||
1950 | 392,500 | 450,000 | 87.2% | 33 | 46 | 79 | 4,968 | 44 | 263 | 31 | ap1951 | |
Archdiocese of Botucatu | ||||||||||||
1959 | 550,000 | 600,000 | 91.7% | 39 | 67 | 106 | 5,188 | 113 | 374 | 35 | ap1960 | |
1966 | 400,000 | 440,000 | 90.9% | 40 | 41 | 81 | 4,938 | 80 | 354 | 32 | ap1967 | |
1970 | 420,000 | 450,000 | 93.3% | 28 | 30 | 58 | 7,241 | 52 | 348 | 30 | ap1971 | |
1976 | 370,000 | 410,000 | 90.2% | 23 | 29 | 52 | 7,115 | 38 | 210 | 40 | ap1977 | |
1980 | 410,000 | 455,000 | 90.1% | 26 | 33 | 59 | 6,949 | 48 | 220 | 45 | ap1981 | |
1990 | 570,000 | 700,000 | 81.4% | 39 | 27 | 66 | 8,636 | 1 | 39 | 52 | ap1991 | |
1999 | 626,000 | 750,000 | 83.5% | 41 | 34 | 75 | 8,346 | 6 | 59 | 130 | 63 | ap2000 |
2000 | 551,500 | 650,000 | 84.8% | 34 | 28 | 62 | 8,895 | 6 | 53 | 128 | 41 | ap2001 |
2001 | 423,000 | 498,581 | 84.8% | 41 | 10 | 51 | 8,294 | 5 | 18 | 115 | 41 | ap2002 |
2002 | 369,000 | 435,307 | 84.8% | 43 | 10 | 53 | 6,962 | 5 | 14 | 85 | 42 | ap2003 |
2003 | 369,000 | 435,307 | 84.8% | 35 | 17 | 52 | 7,096 | 5 | 26 | 130 | 42 | ap2004 |
2004 | 369,000 | 435,308 | 84.8% | 36 | 15 | 51 | 7,235 | 7 | 17 | 130 | 43 | ap2005 |
2006 | 419,000 | 494,000 | 84.8% | 39 | 15 | 54 | 7,759 | 13 | 22 | 130 | 48 | ap2007 |
2012 | 461,000 | 544,000 | 84.7% | 40 | 17 | 57 | 8,087 | 12 | 29 | 73 | 45 | ap2013 |
2015 | 473,000 | 557,000 | 84.9% | 42 | 18 | 60 | 7,883 | 15 | 24 | 72 | 45 | ap2016 |
2018 | 484,890 | 570,995 | 84.9% | 46 | 18 | 64 | 7,576 | 15 | 25 | 68 | 46 | ap2019 |
2020 | 492,500 | 580,000 | 84.9% | 49 | 12 | 61 | 8,073 | 14 | 17 | 60 | 47 | ap2021 |
2022 | 500,000 | 589,000 | 84.9% | 51 | 13 | 64 | 7,812 | 13 | 18 | 52 | 48 | ap2023 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 11 Mar 2024 |
✠