Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvio Maria Dário

Deceased

Bishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1919BornPederneiras
8 Dec 194425.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 196545.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
22 Feb 196545.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Oppidum Novum
2 May 196545.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oppidum Novum
27 Mar 196848.6AppointedBishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil
2 May 197454.7DiedBishop of Itapeva, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Silvio Maria Dário:
Bishop Silvio Maria Dário (born , died ) Bishop of Itapeva

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013