Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Lins

Dioecesis Linensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Irineu Danelón, S.D.B., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 27 May 1950
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Botucatu
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Sao Paulo
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 8,429 (3,255 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul I
  • Web Site: http://www.dioceselins.hpg.com.br/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 92, Rua 9 de Julho 1010, 16400-000 Lins, SP, Brazil
  • Telephone: (014) 522-2165
  • Fax: 522-1622

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Cafelândia
21 June 1926ErectedDiocese of Botucatu Diocese of Cafelândia (erected)
Diocese of Lins
27 May 1950Name ChangedDiocese of Cafelândia Diocese of Lins
16 February 1952Territory LostDiocese of Lins Diocese of Marília (erected)
15 February 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of Botucatu
Diocese of Lins
Diocese of Bauru (erected)
23 March 1994Territory LostDiocese of Lins Diocese of Araçatuba (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Lins
19501,800,0002,000,00090.0%46378321,6864012050ap1951
1966540,000600,00090.0%3032628,7094229637ap1967
1970600,000701,20485.6%3749866,9765228648ap1971
1976460,000500,00092.0%3837756,13324114349ap1977
1980492,000532,00092.5%2741687,23534811551ap1981
1990618,000667,00092.7%3833718,70413711354ap1991
1999213,764264,62280.8%3010405,3441105531ap2000
2000212,577264,62280.3%349434,9431155531ap2001
2001225,000280,45780.2%398474,7872165032ap2002
2002210,500280,69375.0%3610464,5762154532ap2003
2003210,500280,69375.0%379464,5762185031ap2004
2004183,350280,45765.4%409493,7415185032ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 19 Sep 2012