Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Vacaria

Dioecesis Vaccariensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Irineu Gassen, O.F.M., Bishop
  • Orlando Octacílio Dotti, O.F.M. Cap., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 18 January 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Passo Fundo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rio Grande do Sul
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 15,932 (6,153 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul III
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Ramiro Barcelos 806, 95200-000 Vacaria, RS, Brazil
  • Telephone: (054)3231-1373
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Vacaria
8 September 1934ErectedArchdiocese of Porto Alegre Territorial Prelature of Vacaria (erected)
Diocese of Vacaria
18 January 1957ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Vacaria Diocese of Vacaria
13 April 2011Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Vacaria (from Porto Alegre)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Vacaria
1966224,000225,60099.3%941504,4805325622ap1967
1970249,400250,00099.8%1441554,53414522824ap1971
1976200,240206,90896.8%1644603,33724817324ap1977
1980218,576235,00093.0%2048683,2145320724ap1981
1990210,000223,00094.2%2137583,62045019326ap1991
1999183,500197,50092.9%2539642,86715119226ap2000
2000185,000200,50092.3%2933622,98314317427ap2001
2001180,000197,50091.1%2934632,85714416827ap2002
2002180,000197,50091.1%3133642,81214516928ap2003
2003180,000198,70090.6%3134652,76914816328ap2004
2004181,300199,50090.9%3134652,7894415628ap2005
2010195,000217,00089.9%3224563,4822811528ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 22 Aug 2012