Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orlando Octacílio Dotti, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1930 Born
8 Apr 195625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Mar 196938.7AppointedBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
25 May 196938.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
1 Apr 197645.7AppointedBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Bahia, Brazil
30 May 198352.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
5 Feb 198655.6SucceededBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
12 Nov 200373.3ResignedBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Orlando Octacílio Dotti (VIAF: 103505592)
Bishop Orlando Octacílio Dotti O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Vacaria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntonio Prado, Diocese of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopSaint-Gérard, Church, Ijui

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vacaria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,969, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast