Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedito Zorzi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1908Born
30 Nov 193325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Caxias, Brazil
3 Aug 194638.1AppointedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
30 Nov 194638.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
24 Jun 195244.0AppointedBishop of Caxias, Brazil
26 May 198374.9RetiredBishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
2 Dec 198880.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Benedito Zorzi
Bishop Benedito Zorzi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caxias do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNova Pádua

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Apr 2017