Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lúcio Ignácio Baumgaertner

Archbishop Emeritus of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1931 Born
1 Dec 195726.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 198351.8AppointedBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
12 Oct 198352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
20 Nov 198352.2InstalledBishop of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
27 Dec 199564.3AppointedArchbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil
31 Oct 200776.1RetiredArchbishop of Cascavel, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Lúcio Ignácio Baumgaertner
Archbishop Lúcio Ignácio Baumgaertner (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cascavel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNova Milano

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Cascavel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Aug 2017