Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Zattera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1899Born
12 Aug 192324.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 194242.5AppointedBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
31 May 194242.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
1 Sep 197778.1ResignedBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
15 Oct 198788.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Zattera (VIAF: 2398150325524510090008)
Bishop Antônio Zattera (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pelotas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaribaldi
Ordained BishopSanto Antônio, Church, Bento Gonçalves
Death PlacePorto Alegre, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 26
  • c1/loc/d: CB, 25 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast