Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jayme Henrique Chemello

Bishop Emeritus of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1932 BornSão Marcos
6 Dec 195826.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 196936.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
11 Feb 196936.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisica
20 Apr 196936.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisica
1 Sep 197745.1AppointedBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
4 Nov 197745.3InstalledBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
1 Jul 200976.9RetiredBishop of Pelotas, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jayme Henrique Chemello:
Bishop Jayme Henrique Chemello (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pelotas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pelotas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013