Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edson Tasquetto (Taschetto) Damian

Bishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1948 Born
20 Dec 197527.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
4 Mar 200961.0AppointedBishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil
24 May 200961.2Ordained BishopBishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil
8 Nov 202375.6RetiredBishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edson Tasquetto (Taschetto) Damian
(WikiData: Q82820)
Bishop Edson Tasquetto (Taschetto) Damian (born ) Bishop Emeritus of São Gabriel da Cachoeira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJaguari, Diocese of Santa Maria, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopCollège São Miguel, Stadium, São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Diocese of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Gabriel da Cachoeira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,178
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 8 Nov 2023