Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Roraima

Dioecesis Roraimensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 16 October 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Manaus
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Roraima
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 223,644 (86,382 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte 1
  • Official Web Site: https://diocesederoraima.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 163, 69301-970 Boa Vista; Rua Bento Brasil 613, 69301-050 Boa Vista, RR, Brazil
  • Telephone: (095)3224-3741

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Apostolic Administration of Rio Branco
1934ErectedTerritorial Abbey of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro Apostolic Administration of Rio Branco (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Rio Branco
30 August 1944ElevatedApostolic Administration of Rio Branco Territorial Prelature of Rio Branco
19 May 1948Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Rio Branco Territorial Abbey of Nossa Senhora do Monserrate do Rio de Janeiro (erected)
16 February 1952Metropolitan ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Rio Branco (from Belém do Pará)
Territorial Prelature of Roraima
29 April 1963Name ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Rio Branco Territorial Prelature of Roraima
Diocese of Roraima
16 October 1979ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Roraima Diocese of Roraima

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Rio Branco
195018,00020,00090.0%663,0008111ap1951
Territorial Prelature of Roraima
196645,00060,00075.0%12123,75016224ap1967
197045,50054,00084.3%214162,84320274ap1971
197655,80060,00093.0%114153,72019328ap1977
Diocese of Roraima
198047,30054,50086.8%218202,36523399ap1981
1990119,000140,00085.0%216186,611203011ap1991
1999215,000253,00085.0%619258,6001292910ap2000
2000190,000247,13176.9%721286,7852314911ap2001
2001189,200246,73276.7%720277,0072265111ap2002
2002269,790337,23780.0%8182610,3762254618ap2003
2003250,497346,87172.2%1016269,6342234914ap2004
2004200,000324,39761.7%921306,6662264814ap2005
2010215,000350,00061.4%2027474,5742345010ap2011
2014222,800362,00061.5%1923425,304229549ap2015
2017228,500371,00061.6%2227494,6632325110ap2018
2020333,168605,76155.0%2732595,6463416122ap2021
2022350,000636,00055.0%2226487,2916376219ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Territorial Prelature of Rio Branco
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 36, Page 326, to Page 328
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 606, to Page 608
  • Diocese of Roraima
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 71, Page 1,504, and Page 1,505
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.5, 28 Jan 2024; Data: 4 Feb 2024