Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Apparecido José Dias, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1931Born
3 Aug 195826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
13 Dec 197442.9AppointedBishop of Registro, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Feb 197543.1Ordained BishopBishop of Registro, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 Jun 199664.4AppointedBishop of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil
29 May 200472.4DiedBishop of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Apparecido José Dias
Bishop Apparecido José Dias S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Roraima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItajobi

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 16 May 2018

Quantcast