Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Raimundo Vanthuy Neto

Bishop-Elect of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1973 Born
11 Jul 199926.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Roraima, Brazil
3 Jun 200128.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roraima, Brazil
8 Nov 202350.4AppointedBishop of São Gabriel da Cachoeira, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Raimundo Vanthuy Neto
Father Raimundo Vanthuy Neto (born ) Bishop-Elect of São Gabriel da Cachoeira

EventPlace
Birth PlacePau dos Ferros, Diocese of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of São Gabriel da Cachoeira.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2023
  • od/c0: CB, 9 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 9 Nov 2023