Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Roque Paloschi

Archbishop of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1956 Born
7 Dec 198630.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bagé, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
18 May 200548.5AppointedBishop of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil
17 Jul 200548.6Ordained BishopBishop of Roraima, Roraima, Brazil
14 Oct 201558.9AppointedArchbishop of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
13 Dec 201559.1InstalledArchbishop of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Roque Paloschi
Archbishop Roque Paloschi (born ) Archbishop of Porto Velho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProgresso

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Porto Velho.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,946
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Oct 2015
  • i: CB, 21 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018