Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Foz do Iguašu

Dioecesis Iguassuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vacant
  • Laurindo Guizzardi, C.S., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 5 May 1978
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cascavel
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Parana
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 6,822 (2,634 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul 2
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesedefoz.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Patrulheiro Rua Venanti Otremba 585, 85852-020 Foz do Iguacu, PR, Brazil
  • Telephone: (045)3574-5811

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Foz do Iguašu (Iguass˙)
10 May 1926ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Foz do Iguašu (Iguass˙) (erected)
Diocese of Foz do Iguašu
20 June 1959Territory LostDiocese of Foz do Iguašu Diocese of Campo MourŃo (erected)
Diocese of Toledo (erected)
5 May 1978ErectedDiocese of Toledo Diocese of Cascavel (erected)
Diocese of Foz do Iguašu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Foz do Iguašu (Iguass˙)
194995,900100,00095.9%10109,59010315ap1951
Diocese of Foz do Iguašu
1980391,000412,00094.9%2242615,038256612ap1981
1990316,000351,00090.0%530359,028319715ap1991
1999364,000404,00090.1%11233410,705268919ap2000
2000368,000408,00090.2%13213410,823308720ap2001
2001360,000400,00090.0%15213610,000318320ap2002
2002361,000402,00089.8%1622389,500348421ap2003
2003361,000403,00089.6%1423379,756337421ap2004
2004363,000405,00089.6%1522379,810237121ap2005
2006382,372477,96480.0%1922419,326317721ap2007
2013413,000521,00079.3%2227498,4281396027ap2014
2016423,000533,00079.4%2720479,0002334527ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.4, 16 Sep 2018; Data: 30 Sep 2018

Quantcast