Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sérgio de Deus Borges

Bishop of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1966 Born
6 Feb 199326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cornélio Procópio, Parana, Brazil
27 Jun 201245.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
27 Jun 201245.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gergis
18 Aug 201245.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gergis
23 May 201851.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Jul 201952.8AppointedBishop of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana, Brazil
7 Sep 201953.0InstalledBishop of Foz do Iguaçu, Parana, Brazil
22 Sep 201953.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Nossa Senhora do Paraíso em São Paulo (Melkite Greek), Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sérgio de Deus Borges
Bishop Sérgio de Deus Borges (born ) Bishop of Foz do Iguaçu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlfredo Wagner
Ordained BishopColégio Nossa Senhora do Rosário, Cornelio Procópio, Diocese of Cornélio Procópio, Parana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Foz do Iguaçu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2012
  • ob: CB, 27 Jun 2012
  • c2+: CB, 3 Aug 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,527
  • bd: CB, 8 Oct 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2019
  • i: CB, 17 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast