Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel K÷nner, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Foz do Iguašu (Iguass˙)

Titular Bishop of Modra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1885BornSabschutz, Germany
29 Sep 191025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
17 Feb 194054.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Foz do Iguašu (Iguass˙), Brazil
13 Dec 194762.3AppointedPrelate of Foz do Iguašu (Iguass˙), Brazil
13 Dec 194762.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Modra
19 Mar 194862.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Modra
20 Jun 195973.8RetiredPrelate of Foz do Iguašu (Iguass˙), Brazil
9 Dec 196883.3DiedPrelate Emeritus of Foz do Iguašu (Iguass˙), Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel K÷nner:
Bishop Manuel K÷nner S.V.D. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Foz do Iguašu (Iguass˙)

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1948, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013