Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Campo Mourão

Dioecesis Campi Moranensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 20 June 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Maringá
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Parana
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 12,544 (4,845 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul II
  • Mailing Address: Rua Harrison Jose Borges 811, 87300-380 Campo Mourao, PR, Brazil
  • Telephone: (044)3525-1824
  • Fax: 3525-1147

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
20 June 1959ErectedDiocese of Foz do Iguaçu Diocese of Campo Mourão (erected)
28 November 1964Territory LostDiocese of Campo Mourão
Diocese of Londrina
Diocese of Apucarana (erected)
16 December 1965Territory LostDiocese of Campo Mourão
Diocese of Ponta Grossa
Diocese of Toledo
Diocese of Guarapuava (erected)
26 May 1973Territory LostDiocese of Campo Mourão Diocese of Umuarama (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1959250,000.0%71118015ap1960
1966900,0001,050,00085.7%181850,0003012030ap1967
19701,550,000.0%1350630225929ap1971
1976630,000700,00090.0%8263418,529264723ap1977
1980500,000550,00090.9%11314211,904345525ap1981
1990361,000447,00080.8%2722497,3675263733ap1991
1999471,000522,00090.2%30164610,2397326038ap2000
2000281,449351,81280.0%3213456,2547145938ap2001
2001285,616357,02080.0%3415495,8287195738ap2002
2002281,449357,02078.8%3116475,9887205538ap2003
2003285,852357,02080.1%3314476,0817224843ap2004
2004292,012356,24482.0%3314476,2136355438ap2005
2006292,012356,24482.0%4514594,9496286138ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 3 Oct 2012