Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Maringá

Archidioecesis Maringaënsis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Anuar Battisti, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 16 October 1979
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Parana
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 6,294 (2,431 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul II
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquimaringa.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 152, Av. Tiradentes 740, 87001-970 Maringa, PR, Brazil
  • Telephone: (044)227-1706
  • Fax: 226-1667

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Maringá
1 February 1956ErectedDiocese of Jacarezinho Diocese of Maringá (erected)
20 January 1968Territory LostDiocese of Maringá Diocese of Paranavaí (erected)
Archdiocese of Maringá
16 October 1979ElevatedDiocese of Maringá Archdiocese of Maringá

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Maringá
1966900,000950,00094.7%32235516,36388039ap1967
1970750,000800,00093.8%29103919,230199529ap1971
1976447,519517,51986.5%30114110,915303031ap1977
Archdiocese of Maringá
1980474,000542,00087.5%27103712,8103114533ap1981
1990351,000402,00087.3%2953410,3231512534ap1991
1999340,000445,00076.4%464506,80031317045ap2000
2000447,000596,48374.9%525577,84231017547ap2001
2001452,541603,38775.0%536597,67034613448ap2002
2002444,893593,19175.0%587656,84432513752ap2003
2003403,369582,19169.3%536596,836133312551ap2004
2004428,157611,65470.0%545597,256133612651ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 5 Aug 2013