Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Severino Clasen, O.F.M.

Archbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1954 Born
20 Jan 197722.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
18 Apr 198126.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
10 Jul 198228.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 May 200550.9AppointedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 Jun 200551.0Ordained BishopBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Jul 201157.0AppointedBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
4 Sep 201157.2InstalledBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
1 Jul 202066.0AppointedArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
15 Aug 202066.1InstalledArchbishop of Maringá, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Severino Clasen
Archbishop Severino Clasen O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop of Maringá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIndaiá
Ordained BishopSanto Estêvão, Church, Ituporanga

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maringá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2011
  • i: CB, 14 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,903
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jul 2020
  • i: CB, 9 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Aug 2021

Quantcast