Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Gonçalves Knupp

Bishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1967 BornMandaguari
26 Dec 199831.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
24 Apr 199931.4Ordained PriestPriest of Maringá, Parana, Brazil
25 Feb 201547.2AppointedBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
24 Apr 201547.4Ordained BishopBishop of Três Lagoas, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Gonçalves Knupp:
Bishop Luiz Gonçalves Knupp (born ) Bishop of Três Lagoas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Três Lagoas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2015
  • od/ob: CB, 25 Feb 2015
  • c2+: CB, 25 Mar 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,482

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015