Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Toledo

Dioecesis Toletanus in Brasilia



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • João Carlos Seneme, C.S.S., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 20 June 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cascavel
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Parana
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 8,000 (3,090 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul II
  • Web Site: http://www.curia.com.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, C.P. 220, 85900-970 Toledo; Rua General Rondon 2006, 85902-090 Toledo, PR, Brazil
  • Telephone: (045)3252-1417
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
20 June 1959ErectedDiocese of Foz do Iguaçu Diocese of Toledo (erected)
16 December 1965Territory LostDiocese of Campo Mourão
Diocese of Ponta Grossa
Diocese of Toledo
Diocese of Guarapuava (erected)
5 May 1978Territory LostDiocese of Toledo Diocese of Cascavel (erected)
5 May 1978Territory LostDiocese of Toledo Diocese of Foz do Iguaçu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966420,000460,00091.3%1039498,571158827ap1967
1970580,000620,00093.5%2051718,1696712434ap1971
1976905,0001,033,00087.6%27881157,86910215652ap1977
1980320,000400,00080.0%1339526,153496428ap1981
1990289,000396,00073.0%2331545,351785926ap1991
1999250,671320,37278.2%2818465,449385228ap2000
2000300,601328,51191.5%2618446,831354528ap2001
2001302,950340,39489.0%2819476,4451274329ap2002
2002297,555334,33289.0%2519446,7621804329ap2003
2003299,505336,34389.0%2921505,9901744129ap2004
2004305,496344,41588.7%2918476,4991613829ap2005
2010337,000381,00088.5%3418526,4801514430ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Aug 2014