Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Irineu Roque Scherer

Deceased

Bishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1950Born
7 Jan 197827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Parana, Brazil
15 Apr 199847.3AppointedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
20 Jun 199847.5Ordained BishopBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
16 Aug 199847.6InstalledBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
30 May 200756.4AppointedBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil
2 Jul 201665.5DiedBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Irineu Roque Scherer (VIAF: 317122125)
Bishop Irineu Roque Scherer (born , died ) Bishop of Joinville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerro Largo

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 May 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,340
  • d: CB, 2 Jul 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017