Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Joinville

Dioecesis Ioinvillensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Irineu Roque Scherer, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 17 January 1927
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Florianópolis
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Santa Catarina
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 9,119 (3,522 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul IV
  • Web Site: http://members.tripod.com/~diocese/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Jagnaruna 147, 89201-450 Joinville; C.P. 284, 89201-972 Joinville, SC, Brazil
  • Telephone: (047)3451-3700
  • Fax: 3451-3724

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
17 January 1927ErectedDiocese of Santa Caterina Diocese of Joinville (erected)
23 November 1968Territory LostArchdiocese of Florianópolis
Diocese of Joinville
Diocese of Rio do Sul (erected)
19 April 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Florianópolis
Diocese of Joinville
Diocese of Rio do Sul
Diocese of Blumenau (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950250,000340,00073.5%20801002,5009025025ap1951
1966428,000600,00071.3%341181522,81513781044ap1967
1970310,000525,00059.0%2562873,56329449631ap1971
1976300,000510,00058.8%3159903,3331810633934ap1977
1980523,000627,00083.4%2856846,2261711232835ap1981
1990757,000921,00082.2%2857858,905167827341ap1991
1999921,8391,229,11975.0%44631078,6153310525349ap2000
2000550,000650,56284.5%3048787,0513211415431ap2001
2001657,012876,01675.0%3248808,212229518934ap2002
2002669,890892,02075.1%3248808,3732210318734ap2003
2003596,604917,85365.0%3450847,102249216536ap2004
2004608,430936,04665.0%3654906,7602413917239ap2005
2006641,000986,00065.0%4251936,8922914418541ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 28 Nov 2012