Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregório Warmeling

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Joinville, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1918BornOrleães
5 Sep 194325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
3 Apr 195738.9AppointedBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil
29 Jun 195739.1Ordained BishopBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil
9 Mar 199475.8ResignedBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil
3 Jan 199778.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gregório Warmeling:
Bishop Gregório Warmeling (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Joinville

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015