Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orlando Brandes

Archbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1946 BornUrubici
6 Jul 197428.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
9 Mar 199447.9AppointedBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil
5 Jun 199448.1Ordained BishopBishop of Joinville, Santa Catarina, Brazil
10 May 200660.0AppointedArchbishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
23 Jul 200660.2InstalledArchbishop of Londrina, Parana, Brazil
16 Nov 201670.5AppointedArchbishop of Aparecida, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Orlando Brandes
Archbishop Orlando Brandes (born ) Archbishop of Aparecida

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Aparecida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 May 2006
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,326
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Nov 2016