Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wilson Tadeu Jönck, S.C.I.

Archbishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1951 BornVidal Ramos
2 Feb 197220.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
17 Dec 197726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
11 Jun 200351.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
11 Jun 200351.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
16 Aug 200352.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
26 May 201058.9AppointedBishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
18 Jul 201059.0InstalledBishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
28 Sep 201160.2AppointedArchbishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Wilson Tadeu Jönck:
Archbishop Wilson Tadeu Jönck S.C.I. (born ) Archbishop of Florianópolis

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Florianópolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 May 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 29 Oct 2014