Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Francisco Salm

Bishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1952 BornSão Pedro de Alcântara
30 Jul 197926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
26 Sep 201259.9AppointedBishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
24 Nov 201260.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tubarão, Santa Catarina, Brazil
16 Jan 201562.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Blumenau, Santa Catarina, Brazil
24 Jun 201562.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Blumenau, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Francisco Salm:
Bishop João Francisco Salm (born ) Bishop of Tubarão

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tubarão.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2012
  • ob: CB, 27 Sep 2012
  • c2: CB, 6 Nov 2012
  • c34: CB, 25 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,606
  • ab: CB, 16 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 24 Jun 2015