Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vito Schlickmann

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina

Titular Bishop of Gurza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1928 BornSão Ludgero
28 Nov 195425.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 199566.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil
25 Jan 199566.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gurza
25 Mar 199566.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gurza
3 Mar 200475.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Florianópolis, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vito Schlickmann:
Bishop Vito Schlickmann (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Florianópolis

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Florianópolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,502

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014