Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luíz Carlos Eccel

Bishop Emeritus of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1952 Born
30 Jun 197926.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 199846.0AppointedBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
7 Feb 199946.2Ordained BishopBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
24 Nov 201058.0ResignedBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luíz Carlos Eccel
Bishop Luíz Carlos Eccel (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Caçador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrusque

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caçador.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,474

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018