Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo Oneres Marchiori

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1933Born
21 Feb 196026.8Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 197743.7AppointedBishop of Caēador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
17 Apr 197743.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caēador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
18 Apr 198349.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
18 Feb 198753.7SucceededBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
11 Nov 200976.5RetiredBishop of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil
27 Jun 201784.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Lages, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joćo Oneres Marchiori
Bishop Joćo Oneres Marchiori (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lages

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarazinho
Death PlaceLages, Diocese of Lages, Santa Catarina

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Nov 2009
  • d: CB, 27 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jun 2017