Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Lages

Dioecesis Lagensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Irineu Andreassa, O.F.M., Bishop
  • João Oneres Marchiori, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 17 January 1927
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Florianópolis
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Santa Catarina
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 18,417 (7,113 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul IV
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 20, Rua Correia Pinto 247, 88502-970 Lages, SC, Brazil
  • Telephone: (049) 222-1520
  • Fax: 222-6417

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
17 January 1927ErectedDiocese of Santa Caterina Diocese of Lages (erected)
9 December 1933Territory LostDiocese of Lages
Diocese of Ponta Grossa
Territorial Prelature of Palmas (erected)
14 January 1958Territory LostDiocese of Lages
Territorial Prelature of Palmas
Diocese of Chapecó (erected)
23 November 1968Territory LostDiocese of Lages Diocese of Caçador (erected)
12 June 1975Territory LostDiocese of Caçador
Diocese of Chapecó
Diocese of Lages
Diocese of Joaçaba (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950412,443447,84892.1%24791034,00412428632ap1951
1966620,000650,00095.4%43991424,36614556457ap1967
1968600,000700,00085.7%44971414,25512759057ap1971
1976235,000266,81088.1%2324475,00053018020ap1977
1980292,000332,00088.0%3129604,86653118520ap1981
1990368,000390,00094.4%3328616,03282918522ap1991
1999412,000450,00091.6%4224666,24242518523ap2000
2000416,000455,00091.4%3624606,93372518423ap2001
2001420,000460,00091.3%448528,07661018423ap2002
2002315,000350,00090.0%3919585,43152518523ap2003
2003290,000330,00087.9%3419535,47162020024ap2004
2004290,000338,30185.7%3418525,57662718023ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.2, 22 Oct 2012; data: 28 Nov 2012