Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henrique Müller, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Joaçaba, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1922BornPeritiba
16 Jul 194926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Jun 197552.8AppointedBishop of Joaçaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil
14 Sep 197553.1Ordained BishopBishop of Joaçaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil
17 Mar 199976.6RetiredBishop of Joaçaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil
26 May 200077.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Joaçaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Henrique Müller:
Bishop Henrique Müller O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Joaçaba

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013